Skip to main content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Register of Charities
englishcymraeg
Log in to online services

Linked charities THE PRINKNASH ABBEY CHARITIES

Charity number: 232863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Skip to Content
  • Charity overview
  • What, who, how, where
  • Governance
  • Trustees
  • Financial history
  • Assets and liabilities
  • Accounts and annual returns
  • Governing document
  • Linked charities
  • Contact information
Linked charities
  • CHARITIES COMPRISED IN DEED OF GIFT
  • CHARITY COMPRISED IN A DECLARATION OF TRUST
  • CHARITY COMPRISED IN A DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 APRIL 1954
  • CHARITY COMPRISED IN DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 JUNE 1952
  • CHARITY COMPRISED IN DEED OF GIFT DATED 1 AUGUST 1928
  • CHARITY OF KATHERINE LOVERIDGE
  • PRINKNASH ABBEY (GENERAL FUNDS)
  • SPECIAL FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH PRINKNASH ABBEY
  • SPECIAL FUNDS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH PRINKNASH ABBEY
Linked charity 232863-8 CHARITIES COMPRISED IN DEED OF GIFT
Governing document
DEED OF GIFT DATED 01/08/1928 AND SCHEME SEALED 10/05/1957 SCHEME OF 17/07/1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITABLE WORKS CARRIED ON BY THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Registration history
  • 18 August 1964 : Standard registration
  • 04 February 2003 : Removed

Print charity details Loading
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

  • Cookies
  • Accessibility
All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated
© Crown copyright