THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To inspire, recognise and support high achievement in the humanities and social sciences throughout the UK and internationally, and to champion their role and value.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£78,682,842
Donations and legacies | £319.63k | |
Charitable activities | £74.99m | |
Other trading activities | £1.66m | |
Investments | £706.53k | |
Other | £1.01m |
Total expenditure:
£74,421,585
Raising funds | £2.86m | |
Charitable activities | £71.56m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,622,041 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,007,617 from 1 government contract(s) and £66,459,884 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £71.56m | |
Retained for future use | £4.26m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £71.56m | |
Retained for future use | £5.88m |
People

138 Employee(s)
24 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 15 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 November 1965: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH ACADEMY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JULIA BLACK | Chair | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mike Heffernan | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sharon Monteith | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ADITI LAHIRI | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Martin Eimer | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Margot Finn | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor April McMahon | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LYNDA NEAD | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charles Baden-Fuller | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anne Haour | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Li Wei | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Brian Cummings | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kathy Sylva | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gillian Clark | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Judith Still | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lindsay Farmer | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Maxine Berg | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Scott CBE | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cyprian Broodbank | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Patrick Haggard | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Mandler | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elena Lieven | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christina Boswell | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shantashil Mitter | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.73m | £63.03m | £54.99m | £71.95m | £78.68m | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.83m | £63.35m | £54.50m | £69.72m | £74.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £275.70k | £558.65k | £748.70k | £1.01m | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.87m | £59.49m | £49.70m | £63.08m | £66.46m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £324.61k | £359.23k | £253.72k | £1.33m | £319.63k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.89m | £586.20k | £2.00m | £2.05m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £56.64m | £61.32m | £51.66m | £67.17m | £74.99m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £619.88k | £462.49k | £511.14k | £636.77k | £706.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £249.33k | £300.26k | £566.20k | £758.80k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £130.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.00m | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £57.80m | £61.88m | £52.06m | £67.21m | £71.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.03m | £1.47m | £2.44m | £2.52m | £2.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £178.85k | £178.85k | £207.02k | £220.28k | £220.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £50.10m | £54.61m | £42.32m | £55.28m | £56.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £13.35k | £26.66k | £26.19k | £24.77k | £27.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.17m | £17.19m | £17.33m | £19.19m | £24.29m | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.17m | £20.23m | £19.94m | £19.21m | £20.84m | |
|
Other assets | £4.86m | £7.43m | £7.20m | £11.25m | £14.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.18m | £6.06m | £4.48m | £8.18m | £12.68m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 8 AUGUST 1902. SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS 11 MARCH 1960, 17 JUNE 1980, 22 OCTOBER 2002. LATEST VERSION OF BYELAWS EFFECTIVE 19 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE HUMANITIES AND SOCIAL SCIENCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ALBERT RECKITT ARCHAEOLOGICAL FUND
- CATON-THOMPSON FUND FOR ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH
- CHATTERTON LECTURE TRUST FUND
- CROMER GREEK PRIZE FUND
- DAWES HICKS TRUST FUND
- DEREK ALLEN PRIZE FUND
- ENGLISH LITERATURE AND LANGUAGE FUND
- HENRIETTE HERTZ FUND
- ITALIAN LECTURE FUND
- KENYON MEDAL FUND
- LEOPOLD SCHWEICH FUND
- MACCABAEAN LECTURE FUND
- RADCLIFFE BROWN LECTURE IN SOCIAL ANTHROPOLOGY
- RALEIGH FUND FOR HISTORY
- SAHRA TRYPHENA PHILLIPS LECTURE FUND
- SERENA MEDAL FUND
- SIR GEORGE WALTER PROTHERO
- SIR JOHN RHYS MEMORIAL FUND
- STEIN ARNOLD EXPLORATION FUND
- THANK OFFERING TO BRITAIN FUND
- THE BROWNING FUND
- THE STENTON FUND
- THE WEBSTER FUND
- WILLIAM HEPBURN BUCKLER MEMORIAL FUND
- 25 November 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH ACADEMY
10 CARLTON HOUSE TERRACE
LONDON
SW1Y 5AH
- Phone:
- 02079695200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window