EVERGREEN HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main Activities include provision of a meeting place for:- 1. The Dance Group 2. The Whist Group 3. The OAP's meeting place Provides a meeting place for many charitable groups and for events for the over 50's
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bridgend
Governance
- 14 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Edwin Cheetham | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cook | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Channin | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Norris | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD LEWIS | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA PHIPPS | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.81k | £29.67k | £178 | £181 | £409 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.57k | £23.16k | £10.44k | £2.37k | £3.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.75k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH MARCH 1962 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF JANUARY 17 1980 as amended on 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
FOR RELIGIOUS SOCIAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING OF THE OLD PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF BRIDGEND BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL PHYSICAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THEIR BENEFIT AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF BRIDGEND
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Bedw Arian
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 4TP
- Phone:
- 07463649335
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window