Financial history THE BIRMINGHAM CHORAL UNION

Charity number: 233560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.23k £10.89k £10.89k £16.37k £18.07k
Total expenditure £12.31k £12.48k £12.48k £17.94k £17.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A