Financial history THE ALL SAINTS PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 233606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.64k £4.73k £4.83k £4.96k £4.97k
Total expenditure £0 £4.50k £0 £10.80k £7.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A