THE GOOSNARGH AND WHITTINGHAM UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees meet and approve the distribution of the income from investments to the needy within the area of benefit as described in the scheme of the Commissioners of 7th Feb 1977
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 February 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLLR TREVOR JOHN TOMLINSON | Chair | 30 June 1984 |
|
|||||||||||
Paul Graham Stirrup | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Gregor Stewart | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
STEPHEN DAVID HARDMAN | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Dorothy Brewer | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
John Shepherd | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Richard Hall Cllr | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID HUGH MADDOCKS | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Anthony David Burn | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
John Bretherton | Trustee | 21 May 2007 |
|
|||||||||||
JOHN SINGLETON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £4.84k | £5.05k | £3.07k | £7.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £3.63k | £3.67k | £13.42k | £4.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENRALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GOOSNARGH, WHITTINGHAM AND BARTON PART OF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Stanalee Farm
Stanalee Lane
Goosnargh
PRESTON
PR3 2EQ
- Phone:
- 01995640224
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window