THE RETIRED MINISTERS' AND WIDOWS' FUND

Charity number: 233835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist necessitious persons who are: (1) Retired ministers or (2) Widows or widowers of ministers or retired ministers of unitarian free churches, congregational, presbyterian, united reform and of the baptist denominations in England and Wales. Grants paid can be either annual and/or one-off grants. They are at the discretion of the trustees following consideration of written applications.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £46,420
Total expenditure: £33,774

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS WIDOWS OF PROTESTANT DISSENTING MINISTERS OF THE THREE DENOMINATIONS (Previous name)
  • THE WIDOWS FUND OF THE THREE DENOMINATIONS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Geoffrey Nicholls Trustee 30 April 2020
None on record
ANN ELIZABETH SHARPLES Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
REV MARTIN NORMAN WHITELL Trustee 17 May 2017
None on record
Rev JEFFREY BOWES Trustee 17 May 2017
THE MINISTERIAL FELLOWSHIP BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
THE GREAT MEETING HOUSE UNITARIAN CHURCH COVENTRY
Received: On time
MINISTERS' PENSION FUND
Received: On time
PAUL ANTHONY DAVIS Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
MALCOLM JAMES JOHNSTON Trustee
None on record
Rev JULIAN JAMES MACRO Trustee
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WESSEX) TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CMW CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr DOREEN JANE WILLIAMS Trustee
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST)
Received: 51 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.11k £35.07k £40.64k £47.16k £46.42k
Total expenditure £36.30k £31.01k £28.17k £26.85k £33.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
107 LAVENDER SWEEP
LONDON
SW11 1EA
Phone:
01438489171