Financial history SOPHIA AND ELIZABETH BARNARD TRUST

Charity number: 233887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £287 £348 £35 £123 £200
Total expenditure £285 £286 £99 £96 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A