THE HAWTHORNE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 233921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the trust is to distribute its income to charitable bodies which will make good use of what they receive. The trustees particularly aim to support charities in the Hereford and Worcester areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £243,549
Total expenditure: £309,281

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER JACKSON CLARK FCA Trustee 26 September 2011
THE OFENHEIM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TWO R'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HONOR FROST FOUNDATION
Received: 10 days late
SOUTHERN THAILAND ELEPHANT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RICHARD WHITE Trustee
None on record
ALEXANDRA SUSAN BERINGTON Trustee
None on record
THOMAS BERINGTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £209.06k £158.73k £167.44k £210.71k £243.55k
Total expenditure £317.74k £361.84k £432.12k £364.53k £309.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RSM
Priory Place
New London Road
CHELMSFORD
Essex
CM2 0PP
Phone:
01245354402
Website:

No information available