DEWSBURY AND DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 234401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our charity gives grants for household goods, holidays to aid recuperation after illness, vouchers for food and clothing and the purchase of medical aids.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,230
Total expenditure: £23,138

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARDWELL ANGELS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART BROWN Chair
NORTH DUFFIELD AND SKIPWITH PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Suzanne Amanda Baker Trustee 04 August 2023
DEWSBURY COMMUNITY OUTREACH
Received: On time
IRIS MARY BETTNEY CERT CIH Trustee 09 November 2017
THE FLETCHER CHARITY
Received: On time
WALKER AND GREENWOOD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THORNHILL LEES OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE
Received: On time
MARGARET WATSON optional Trustee
THE WHITTUCK CHARITY
Received: On time
DEWSBURY GUILD OF HELP
Received: On time
David Keith SHAW Trustee
None on record
DOLORES BERNARDETTE MULRENNAN optional Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.01k £4.75k £4.70k £4.61k £4.23k
Total expenditure £21.20k £14.47k £10.50k £15.68k £23.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
130 BOOTHROYD LANE
DEWSBURY
WF13 2LW
Phone:
01924463308
Website:

alanwwaysidetalktalk.net