Accounts and annual returns APOSTOLIC MISSION TO ITALIAN EMIGRANTS IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 234437
Charity reporting is overdue by 1663 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1663 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1663 days