KENNEDY MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kennedy Memorial Trust administers the Kennedy Memorial Fund commemorating President John F. Kennedy by maintaining a memorial at Runnymede and awarding scholarships to British graduate students to attend Harvard University and the Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Each year the Trust provides graduate students with tuition fees, health cover, a stipend & travel grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 May 1964: Standard registration
- KENNEDY MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR MARK JEREMY WALPORT FMEDSCI | Chair | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Morley | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kirstie Blair | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shantashil Mitter | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Tariq Baloch | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gareth McKinley | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tilly Anne Franklin | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Philip Clifford MBE | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira Paul Wallace OBE | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Sieghart | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442.01k | £279.21k | £281.76k | £773.89k | £292.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £783.14k | £314.30k | £991.67k | £803.99k | £691.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £158.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £803.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
APPEAL FOR FUNDS ISSUED ON 7 MAY 1964. TRUST DEED DATED 4 JULY 1964 AND AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE MEN AND WOMEN FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM TO GO AS UNDER-GRADUATES OR GRADUATES TO HARVARD UNIVERSITY, RADCLIFFE COLLEGE OR THE MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY. 2. TO SECURE AND LAY OUT A SITE ON RUNNYMEDE AS A PLACE TO WHICH THE PUBLIC HAVE ACCESS AND TO PROVIDE FOR ITS MANAGEMENT AND UPKEEP.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BIRDCAGE WALK
LONDON
SW1H 9JJ
- Phone:
- 02072221151
- Email:
- TIM@KENNEDYTRUST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window