Trustees KENNEDY MEMORIAL FUND
Charity Number: 234715
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR MARK JEREMY WALPORT FMEDSCI | Chair | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tariq Baloch | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gareth McKinley | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tilly Anne Franklin | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Philip Clifford MBE | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira Paul Wallace OBE | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Sieghart | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
PROF FIONA ELIZABETH MACPHERSON | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Flanders | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.