Financial history THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 235039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £357 £364 £4.86k £286 £2.29k
Total expenditure £2.03k £1.53k £3.03k £1.26k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A