THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PENSIONS BOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the best possible support and care, within available resources, to those who have retired from stipendiary and lay ministry within the Church of England, and to their dependants, through the provision of retirement and supported housing, and through discretionary grants to ensure beneficiaries have a minimum income standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£43,606,000
Donations and legacies | £15.10m | |
Charitable activities | £25.06m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.81m | |
Other | £1.63m |
Total expenditure:
£38,467,000
Raising funds | £79.00k | |
Charitable activities | £38.39m | |
Other | £0 |
-£755,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £79.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.39m | |
Retained for future use | £5.14m |
People

179 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- BISHOP MORLEY COLLEGE (Working name)
- CHURCH WORKERS PENSIONS AUGMENTATION FUND (Working name)
- CLERGY (WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS) PENSIONS AUGMENTATION FUND (Working name)
- CLERGY PENSIONS AUGMENTATION FUND (Working name)
- CLERGY RETIREMENT HOUSING TRUST (Working name)
- CLERGY WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS PENSIONS AUGMENTATION FUND (Working name)
- SUFFOLK CLERGY HOUSING TRUST (Working name)
- THE CHURCH WORKERS PENSIONS AUGMENTATION FUND (Working name)
- THE REV JOSHUA CASE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROLD CLIVE MATHER | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Trudie Anne Wigley | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Victoria Paramour | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eleanor Robertshaw | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wilson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY NEIL KING | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Southworth | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Titley | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nikesh Patel | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Rodger | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger Boulton | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Osbourne | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.12m | £29.08m | £29.07m | £31.66m | £43.61m | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.11m | £29.68m | £30.24m | £34.86m | £38.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.88m | £6.17m | £6.13m | £6.40m | £15.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.51m | £21.04m | £20.44m | £22.14m | £25.06m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.62m | £1.39m | £1.66m | £1.61m | £1.81m | |
|
Income - Other | £2.12m | £479.00k | £844.00k | £1.52m | £1.63m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.65m | £785.00k | £597.00k | £739.00k | £83.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.08m | £29.63m | £30.18m | £34.78m | £38.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £23.00k | £49.00k | £68.00k | £81.00k | £79.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £125.00k | £121.00k | £112.00k | £118.00k | £191.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £49 | £67.00k | £81.00k | £79.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £259.02m | £260.06m | £259.17m | £258.66m | £259.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | £42.27m | £41.74m | £46.86m | £41.68m | £40.86m | |
|
Other assets | £11.13m | £7.43m | £5.77m | £5.27m | £6.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£775.00k | -£624.00k | -£465.00k | -£320.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £182.72m | £180.77m | £179.48m | £181.72m | £179.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PENSIONS MEASURE 2018 AS AMENDED BY THE LEGISLATIVE REFORM (CHURCH OF ENGLAND PENSIONS) ORDER 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADMINISTRATION OF CLERGY PENSIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CLERGY PENSIONS MEASURE 1961. SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 23 April 1993 : Standard registration
- 26 June 2003 : Removed
- 26 June 2003 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
C OF E
PENSIONS BOARD
29 GREAT SMITH STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3PS
- Phone:
- 02078981000
- Email:
- housing@churchofengland.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window