LYDIA THOMAS CHILTON GIFT FUND

Charity number: 236670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty amongst the elderly and other defined groups in the Parish of Chilton, Oxfordshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024

Total income: £980
Total expenditure: £316

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ALBERT BERRY Chair 15 January 2016
None on record
Steven Brian Launchbury Trustee 11 December 2019
None on record
Hazel Helen Benton Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
PAM ROLLS Trustee 15 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW'S, HARWELL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/02/2020 01/02/2021 01/02/2022 01/02/2023 01/02/2024
Total gross income £499 £590 £637 £980 £980
Total expenditure £418 £702 £344 £316 £316
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2023 06 February 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2020 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 ELDERFIELD CRESCENT
CHILTON
DIDCOT
OX11 0RY
Phone:
01235834475
Website:

No information available