Financial history CROSTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 236699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £55.48k £56.96k £55.69k £51.22k £28.23k
Total expenditure £17.75k £16.37k £40.63k £146.84k £2.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A