THE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 236878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £258,369
Total expenditure: £335,379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE FREE CHURCHES' COUNCIL (Working name)
  • THE FREE CHURCHES GROUP (Working name)
  • THE FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev HELEN CAMERON Chair 31 March 2020
THE CORNERSTONE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Tessa Henry-Robinson Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Rev DANIEL RAY YARNELL Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
Yvonne Campbell Trustee 31 March 2020
THE LIVERPOOL AND DISTRICT FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL
Received: On time
Rev DESETA Florence DAVIS Trustee 17 November 2014
None on record
Rev JAMES ALEXANDER BRESLIN Trustee 17 September 2014
None on record
ERIC SOUTHWICK Trustee 15 April 2013
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH STANLEY STREET INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH, SEAHAM
Received: On time
HELP, EDUCATION AND RESOURCES TO BRING EVERYONE ALL TOGETHER
Received: On time
THE WELCOME DIRECTORY
Received: On time
Rev TREVOR HOWARD Trustee 25 November 2011
CHURCHES IN COMMUNITIES INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
WHITLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
KICKSTARTED
Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
CHARIS COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £294.34k £225.98k £196.63k £230.33k £258.37k
Total expenditure £381.60k £367.75k £312.56k £315.30k £335.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Free Churches House
27 Tavistock Square
LONDON
WC1H 9HH
Phone:
02036518339