Financial history BRENTFORD BAPTIST TRUST

Charity Number: 237594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.95k £16.65k £20.95k £23.48k £26.93k
Total expenditure £18.00k £21.50k £19.63k £20.13k £21.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A