THE MARTYRS MEMORIAL, RAYLEIGH, ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises memorial meetings. Arranges speakers at meetings. Keeps memorial in good order.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 22 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISTER DENNIS EDWARD FAYERS | Chair | 04 February 1966 |
|
|
||||
Nathan William Evans | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Miles | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TOMS | Trustee | 11 February 2011 |
|
|||||
DOCTOR NIC SNAILUM | Trustee | 10 February 2006 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BUTLER | Trustee | 04 February 1994 |
|
|||||
MISTER CHRISTOPHER NEAL BANKS | Trustee | 05 February 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £30 | £40 | £130 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £160 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NONE.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PROTESTAND CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PERPTUATING THE MEMORY OF FOUR PROTESTANT MARTYRS, NAMELY THOMAS CAUSTON AND JOHN ARDELEY WHO SUFFERED AT RAYLEIGH AND ROBERT DRAKES AND WILLIAM TYMS WHO SUFFERED AT SMITHFIELD.
Area of benefit
RAYLEIGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 REEDS WAY
WICKFORD
SS12 0EA
- Phone:
- 07950190203
- Email:
- RAYLEIGHMMT1@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window