THE DUKE OF BEDFORD'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Owns and maintain allotments and gives surplus revenue to needy people living in the area of the scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Anthony Staite | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Janice Conway Read | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laurie Stephen Clow | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|||||
John Bailey | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUSTINE COLLETTE MCPHERSON FULFORD | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £1.59k | £1.53k | £1.41k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £1.24k | £1.46k | £959 | £868 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHESHAM BOIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Nicholas
Hazlemere Road
Penn
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP10 8AA
- Phone:
- 07548735719
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window