Financial history POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 237921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.39k £6.15k £32.83k £6.11k £5.78k
Total expenditure £8.09k £4.16k £30.47k £3.50k £10.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £27.82k N/A N/A