Financial history SHARE OF CHARITY OF HENRY SMITH (WARBLETON ESTATE)

Charity number: 237945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2020 29/09/2021 29/09/2022 29/09/2023 29/09/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.00k £0 £0 £1.85k
Total expenditure £1.20k £0 £700 £700 £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A