THE PROTESTANT ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining against all encroachment the Scriptural Doctrines of the Reformation and principles of religious liberty. Advancing the Christian religion and where possible relieving poverty among persecuted Protestants. Producing a bi-monthly magazine. Holding Protestant Martyr Commemoration Meetings, having a presence at County and Agricultural shows, and maintaining a preaching ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Lithuania
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 December 1967: Standard registration
- ALLIANCE PUBLICATIONS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS BANKS | Chair | 14 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev Peter Malcolm Simpson | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRIS DAVID | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD PHILPOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS FAYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW TOMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR FRED RAYNSFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.74k | £63.62k | £25.65k | £33.34k | £75.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.58k | £104.39k | £89.32k | £77.22k | £81.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 3RD NOVEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED 3RD OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
TO BRING THE SAVING FAITH OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST TO ROMAN CATHOLICS, ANGLO-CATHOLICS, AND ALL THOSE NOT KNOWING THE SCRIPTURES OR THE POWER OF GOD. TO MAINTAIN AGAINST ALL ENCROACHMENT THE SCRIPTURAL DOCTRINES OF THE REFORMATION AND THE PRINCIPLES OF RELIGIOUS LIBERTY. WHERE POSSIBLE TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE RELIGION AMONG PERSECUTED PROTESTANTS. TO SEEK TO PRESERVE THE PURITY OF THE GOSPEL AS RECORDED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Protestant Alliance
7 Jubilee Cottages
Station Road
Marston Moretaine
Bedford
MK43 0PN
- Phone:
- 01234766565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window