Financial history THE STOUR FESTIVAL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 238476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £88.56k £138.44k £141.11k £192.17k £210.76k
Total expenditure £172.04k £116.54k £147.16k £186.91k £195.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A