THE MOSS COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It manages six residences originally set up for widows of Ashwell, which now accommodates persons who are normally over the age of 60, with strong local connections and who are able to live independently.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIDA SHAW MA | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fleming | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter ruch | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Jessica Mitchell | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Christine Emily Campbell | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
John Rhodes Mr | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Munns | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Anne Patricia Robertshaw | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.60k | £29.30k | £15.36k | £12.99k | £27.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.88k | £29.40k | £5.27k | £61.97k | £17.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 7 JUNE 1979 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 JULY 2006 AND WRITTEN RESOLUTIONS OF THE TRUSTEES DATED 24.4.07 AND 23 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 20 Mar 2018 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 25 May 2019
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR POOR, AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ASHWELL WITH A PREFERENCE FOR WIDOWS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASHWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 High Street
Ashwell
BALDOCK
Hertfordshire
SG7 5NW
- Phone:
- 07855796832
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window