THE YORKSHIRE UNION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help and support given to Unitarian congregations and individuals in the Yorkshire and Humberside region. Sharing of worship, discussions and social activity. Grants made to children and adults attending national Unitarian activities. Grants for worship studies courses for lay preachers across the district. Donation to Send a child to Hucklow charity. Grant towards maintaining church premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 October 1967: Standard registration
- 12 November 2014: Funds received from 228110 ANNE POPPLE TRUST
- YORKSHIRE UNITARIAN UNION (Working name)
- YUU (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATEUSZ ADRIAN SLABOSZEWSKI | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Autumn-Cox | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Parkinson | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS ELIZABETH FAIERS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.28k | £15.31k | £15.52k | £14.78k | £15.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.53k | £10.43k | £4.62k | £9.13k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 June 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 July 2020 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1959 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 1999, 17 JANUARY 2004 AND 16 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SPREAD THE PRINCIPALS AND FAITH OF LIBERAL RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CABLE PLACE
HUNSLET
LEEDS
LS10 1GE
- Phone:
- 07902446705
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window