THE SECOND POOR CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to elderly/needy people in village of Templecombe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 February 1965: Standard registration
- Abbas and Templecombe Aid (Working name)
- Abbas and Templecombe Aid (Formerly: The Second Poor Charity) (Working name)
- ST THOMAS DAY CHARITY (Working name)
- UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col John Andrew Grierson | Chair | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TINA JANE Chapman | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Maria Kathleen Vaughan | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
ARLO ALBERT CHARLES CUSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/12/2019 | 21/12/2020 | 21/12/2021 | 21/12/2022 | 21/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350 | £350 | £350 | £1.09k | £2.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240 | £0 | £1.00k | £1.23k | £1.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 December 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P R VOL 11 P417 418 SCHEME OF 20 JANUARY 1914 AND NOTICE UNDER SEC 2 CA 1985 DATED 5 APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF ABBAS AND TEMPLECOMBE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS.
Area of benefit
ABBAS AND TEMPLE COMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Barn
Combe Hill
TEMPLECOMBE
Somerset
BA8 0LJ
- Phone:
- 01963370056
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window