THE BRITISH CARTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society facilitates the exchange of information and ideas by holding meetings and publishing periodicals and books. Members participate in National and International Conferences to advance cartographic education and encourage research. A number of awards are made each year to reward excellence in the field of cartography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Seldon | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Burry | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Kent | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry Holbrook | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Joseph Anderson | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr GUISEPPE CASSETTARI | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Naylor | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Budas | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Goldsmith | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN PEATY | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Watts | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Sherren | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.79k | £78.82k | £83.27k | £71.11k | £81.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.31k | £71.76k | £83.38k | £58.66k | £64.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS AS ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AT THE EXTRAORDINARY GENERAL MEETING, 5TH SEPTEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THAT CLASS OF KNOWLEDGE WHICH DISTINGUISHES THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CARTOGRAPHY AND FOR THAT PURPOSE, INTER ALIA, TO: (A) FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND IDEAS AMONGST THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND OTHERS - (B) HOLD MEETINGS AND TO PUBLISH PERIODICALS AND BOOKS - (C) ARRANGE AND PARTICIPATE IN NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCES - (D) ADVANCE CARTOGRAPHIC EDUCATION AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH - (E) ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN LIBRARIES AND COLLECTIONS OF MAPS, BOOKS, PLANS AND PHOTOGRAPHS - (F) PRINT, PUBLISH, SELL, LEND AND DISTRIBUTE COMMUNICATIONS MADE TO THE SOCIETY - (G) PROVIDE AND AWARD MEDALS AND PRIZES ALL IN CONNECTION WITH CARTOGRAPHY (H) DO ALL OTHER THINS INCIDENTAL TO THE SOCIETY'S OBJECTS, PROVIDED THAT NO PART OF THE PROPERTY OR FUNDS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE APPLIED OTHER THAN FOR CHARITABLE PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pulpitfield Close
WALTON ON THE NAZE
Essex
CO14 8RS
- Phone:
- 02392422009
- Email:
- admin@cartography.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window