Financial history CLOTHING CHARITY

Charity number: 240345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.80k £11.51k £1.22k £1.57k £1.54k
Total expenditure £2.07k £30 £100 £20 £870
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A