Financial history THE CORNFORTH HOMES

Charity number: 241482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.42k £14.42k £15.25k £24.59k £30.28k
Total expenditure £24.93k £13.01k £12.54k £22.48k £4.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A