WYMONDHAM FUEL ALLOTMENTS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vouchers for food shopping before Christmas for those on low incomes in the Parish of Wymondham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BARRETT | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES SAVAGE | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN GIBBINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER ANDREW LAIRD THORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD BARTRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM LAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £4.33k | £10.68k | £18.57k | £8.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £2.70k | £9.18k | £17.68k | £7.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE ACTS. (P.R.29 PT. 1 P.646) AS AMENDED ON 20 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR RESIDENTS IN WYMONDHAM AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WYMONDHMAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 DOWNHAM CRESCENT
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0SF
- Phone:
- 01953600432
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window