THE PILLING TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity awards grants to churches within the Anglican communion and other institutions in order to further its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 1965: Standard registration
- THE JOHN PILLING TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MARTIN SUTCLIFFE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr Maximillian Elliott | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev PETER HOWELL-JONES | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PROFESSOR IAN GRAHAM TRACEY | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
ANDREW JAMES PALMER | Trustee | 12 November 2009 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr SIMON GEOFFREY LINDLEY FRCO | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||
ANNE MELINDA ELDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.06k | £307.80k | £314.90k | £321.72k | £376.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.35k | £288.17k | £232.72k | £238.82k | £195.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH MAY 1957
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS BELIEF OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE OF THE MUSICAL SIDE OF CHURCH SERVICES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 16b
The Beehive Lions Drive
Blackburn
Lancashire
- Phone:
- 01254686600
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window