THE CHARITY OF THOMAS HOLLINGSWORTH

Charity Number: 241979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

n/a

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £516
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRAMCOTE CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HANNAH LAND Trustee 17 July 2019
THE CHARITY OF HENRY HANLEY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF MARY CHARLTON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF FRANCES DIXON
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF CATHERINE SHERWIN GREGORY
Received: On time
THIS HOPE CIO
Received: On time
Councillor Ian Tyler Trustee 17 July 2019
THE CHARITY OF HENRY HANLEY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF MARY CHARLTON
Received: On time
Councillor David Watts Trustee 17 July 2019
THE CHARITY OF HENRY HANLEY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF MARY CHARLTON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £293 £306 £327 £382 £516
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Broxtowe Borough Council
Council Offices
Foster Avenue
Beeston
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 1AB
Phone:
01159177777
Website:

No information available