COVENTRY HOLY TRINITY CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 242056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintain the upkeep of the church building of Holy Trinity Coventry and associated properties forming the endowment of the trust and from defraying payments for the services in the church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £47,634
Total expenditure: £36,496

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 1967: Standard registration
  • 31 August 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 31 August 2012: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY CHURCH ESTATE (Working name)
  • COVENTRY HOLY TRINITY CHURCH CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • HOLY TRINITY CHURCH CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Williams Trustee 06 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, COVENTRY
Received: On time
Nehemiah Aderibigbe Akinyele Trustee 15 May 2022
LISTENING EARS
Received: On time
Andrew Theogift Jeyanth Selwyn Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Rev Richard Hibbert Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
Christopher Charles Howard Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
SUE WILCOX Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
PAUL BRIAN DOGGETT BSC Trustee 04 December 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, COVENTRY
Received: On time
Professor Simon Brake Trustee 04 December 2013
COVENTRY CITIZENS ADVICE
Received: On time
SIR CHARLES BARRATT MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HOLY TRINITY (COVENTRY) DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
COVENTRY OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time
PETER CHRISTOPHER GRIFFITHS Trustee 01 December 2011
None on record
MR BILL JOHNSON Trustee
HOLY TRINITY (COVENTRY) DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
SAVERS
Received: On time
COVENTRY OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £43.06k £112.22k £36.03k £47.79k £47.63k
Total expenditure £65.21k £107.11k £36.46k £32.74k £36.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 21 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 21 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 11 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 05 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 05 December 2021 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 05 December 2021 280 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 NOVEMBER 1906
Charitable objects
PAYMENT TO VICAR FOR PREACHING A SERMON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 17 August 1967 : Standard registration
  • 31 August 2012 : Removed
  • 31 August 2012 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
5A PRIORY ROW
COVENTRY
CV1 5EX
Phone:
02476220418
Website:

No information available