THE CHRISTADELPHIAN ISOLATION LEAGUE

Charity Number: 242098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The spiritual support and welfare of members of the Christadelphian community, their children and anyone interested in their beliefs throughout the world by means of newsletters, Bible Studies, lessons for children, exhortations - all delivered by post or email.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £240,251
Total expenditure: £147,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Albania
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Australia
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Benin
  • Botswana
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • China
  • Croatia
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Ecuador
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Fiji
  • France
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Greece
  • Grenada
  • Guyana
  • Hong Kong
  • Hungary
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Jamaica
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Lithuania
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Malta
  • Mauritius
  • Mexico
  • Moldova
  • Mozambique
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Nigeria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Philippines
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Scotland
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Singapore
  • Solomon Islands
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Lucia
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Tanzania
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • Vanuatu
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 1965: Standard registration
  • 31 July 2023: Funds received from 1075016 MORPETH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
  • 10 October 2023: Funds received from 1166583 YEOVIL CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CIL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebekah Fifield Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
DAVID BEZANT FCCA Trustee 13 January 2018
None on record
DAVID HARVEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £155.90k £96.48k £102.96k £119.08k £240.25k
Total expenditure £129.76k £116.85k £115.88k £134.44k £147.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 NORWICH ROAD
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0SH
Phone:
01953602424