THE NIGHTINGALE CENTRE (UNITARIAN)

Charity number: 242256
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Unitarian conference centre based in the village of Great Hucklow, Derbyshire to further the religious and other charitable work of the Unitarian and Free Christian Churches including: (a) the relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, financial hardship or other disadvantage; and (b) the provision of facilities for the education of students of educational establishments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £381,875
Total expenditure: £409,617

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1966: Standard registration
  • 31 May 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 31 May 2011: Funds transferred to 242256-1 THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE HOME FOR MEN
  • 31 May 2011: Funds received from
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE NIGHTINGALE CENTRE - THE UNITARIAN HOLIDAY AND CONFERENCE CENTRE (Working name)
  • THE UNITARIAN CONVALESCENT AND HOLIDAY CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sue Cooper Trustee 31 August 2024
YORK UNITARIANS CIO
Received: On time
THE SEND A CHILD TO HUCKLOW FUND CIO
Received: On time
MICHAEL ROBERT TRACEY Trustee 31 August 2024
THE LEONARD CHAMBERLAIN TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHY CHRISTINE HEWERDINE Trustee 31 August 2024
PROCEEDS OF SALE OF MANSE HELD IN CONNEXION WITH RAWTENSTALL UNITARIAN CHURCH
Received: On time
CHORLEY UNITARIAN CHAPEL
Received: On time
MARION BAKER Trustee 31 August 2024
DONCASTER UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCH TRUST FUND AND PROPERTIES HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH
Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH UPPER CHAPEL
Received: On time
WILLIAM FISHER
Received: On time
MINISTERS' PENSION FUND
Received: On time
Cathie Masztalerz Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
Philip Horsfield Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
Richard Crompton Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
John Rowland Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
COLIN PARTINGTON Trustee 31 August 2024
THE SEND A CHILD TO HUCKLOW FUND CIO
Received: On time
Jennifer Anne Jacobs Trustee 24 April 2021
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES
Received: 1 day late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £379.66k £635.81k £248.15k £341.66k £381.88k
Total expenditure £413.72k £322.85k £365.97k £558.03k £409.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £72.74k £109.37k £1.88k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £440.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £9.19k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £82.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £30.78k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £72.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £400.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £290.55k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £32.30k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £870 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 September 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 23 September 2024 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 March 2022 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 16 March 2022 229 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1 JUNE 1964 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26 FEBRUARY 1975
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF A CONVALESCENT OR REST HOME FOR PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 07 September 1966 : Standard registration
  • 31 May 2011 : Removed
  • 31 May 2011 : Asset transfer out
  • 31 May 2011 : Asset transfer in

Contact information

Address:
The Nightingale Centre
Great Hucklow
BUXTON
SK17 8RH
Phone:
01298 871218