BADDILEY CONSOLIDATED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF BADDILEY, BRINDLEY, BURLAND AND FADDILEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 02 July 1965: Standard registration
- CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WINWARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Blackburn | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robinson | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wright | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arthur NIGEL BURROWS | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD HARPER | Trustee |
|
||||||
STUART WINWARD ACCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £9.73k | £9.24k | £8.97k | £8.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.50k | £11.00k | £10.55k | £9.50k | £8.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 APRIL 1992.
Charitable objects
(1)RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF BADDILEY, BRINDLEY, BURLAND AND FADDILEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2)THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS. (3)IF AND IN SO FAR IN ANY YEAR THE TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE TO EXPEND INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF IN NEED AS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE SAME AS THEY THINK FIT FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COTTAGE
STONELEY GREEN
BURLAND
NANTWICH
CW5 8QA
- Phone:
- 01270524308
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window