ROBERT FORSTERS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income from land and investments after the will of Robert Forster (1609) is used to relieve hardship in the areas of Stainforth and Hatfield, South Yorkshire. Grants are restricted to any persons either individually or as a group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Doncaster
Governance
- 31 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RAY HARPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KEN KEEGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIA KEEGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
RITA CHAFEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TERRY GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £4.63k | £6.01k | £5.94k | £5.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £0 | £3.75k | £5.62k | £6.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 APRIL 1975 AS AMENDED ON 15 MARCH 1994 AND 23 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
(1) IN PAYING ·40.00 ANNUALLY IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE, HATFIELD AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN, THE AMOUNT TO BE REVIEWED EVERY THREE YEARS. (2) FOR RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY ANY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF EITHER HATFIELD OR STAINFORTH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
HATFIELD AND STAINFORTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Westminster Drive
Dunsville
Doncaster
DN7 4QD
- Phone:
- 01302888474
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window