WOODTHORPE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 244192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF STAVELEY, BARLBOROUGH OR UNSTONE WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £8,461
Total expenditure: £7,854

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Tidd Trustee 18 October 2024
DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
DERBYSHIRE UNEMPLOYED WORKERS' CENTRES
Received: On time
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Keith Hubbard Trustee 04 May 2023
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PAUL A JACOBS Trustee 01 July 2022
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PAUL WILSON Trustee 01 April 2022
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
RUTH SEDWICK Trustee 01 April 2022
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
JANE WHALLEY Trustee 01 April 2022
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
SANDRA STRUGGLES Trustee 14 November 2016
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PETER H NORMAN Trustee
THE STAVELEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.43k £6.52k £7.01k £8.07k £8.46k
Total expenditure £5.28k £2.78k £8.68k £7.16k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 WIGLEY ROAD
INKERSALL
CHESTERFIELD
S43 3ER
Phone:
01246474457
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available