Financial history JOHN TUTHILL

Charity number: 244225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/10/2020 10/10/2021 10/10/2022 10/10/2023 10/10/2024
Total gross income £840 £780 £844 £886 £912
Total expenditure £800 £763 £762 £750 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A