THE SOMERTON CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 December 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Mary Swan | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Thomas John Davis | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hilbourne | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RODGER RAY CALDERWOOD | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Ann Pike | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.31k | £90.60k | £97.40k | £104.96k | £115.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.40k | £37.06k | £27.59k | £34.41k | £90.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH OCTOBER 1889. AND SCHEME OF THE 7TH OCTOBER 1969.
Charitable objects
THE EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SOMERTON; ANY SURPLUS TO BE APPLIED IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES AND FURNITURE OF THE SAME.
Area of benefit
SOMERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Ivyleaf Road
SOMERTON
Somerset
TA11 6RP
- Phone:
- 01458272002
- Email:
- raythompson362@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window