Financial history JOSEPH HENRY UNWIN SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 244776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.37k £1.53k £2.63k £175 £195
Total expenditure £332 £2.15k £500 £300 £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A