Financial history CREDITON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 247038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £51.92k £51.06k £53.26k £60.59k £65.77k
Total expenditure £16.68k £17.30k £18.43k £20.27k £23.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A