CREDITON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 247038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Administers 8 almshouse properties and provides assistance and support to the inhabitants of Crediton Town and the Parish of Crediton Hamlets who are in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £60,590
Total expenditure: £20,266

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CREDITON UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
  • CREDITON UNITED TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW ALBERT WHITE Chair
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE
Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KELLY TRUST (CREDITON)
Received: On time
James King Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Hannah Zorlu Trustee 02 June 2019
None on record
Ruth Marie Vigers Trustee 09 April 2018
ST LUKE'S PROPRIETARY CHAPEL, POSBURY
Received: On time
SARAH LOUISE TURNER Trustee
None on record
ANDY COLE Trustee
None on record
JOYCE HARRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £45.73k £51.92k £51.06k £53.26k £60.59k
Total expenditure £31.75k £16.68k £17.30k £18.43k £20.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 MAY 1983
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITY WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF CREDITON AND PARISH OF CREDITON HAMLETS
Registration history
  • 02 March 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Armstrong Room
5 Parr House
Lennard Road
CREDITON
Devon
EX17 2AP
Phone:
01363776529
Website:

No information available