Financial history UXBRIDGE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 247214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £395.52k £409.74k £409.32k £432.36k £487.12k
Total expenditure £265.59k £259.84k £466.94k £292.37k £269.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A