Financial history FEDERATION OF OLD CORNWALL SOCIETIES

Charity Number: 247283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £136.37k £7.20k £6.46k £15.14k £25.40k
Total expenditure £8.34k £3.83k £19.81k £15.85k £21.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.87k