THE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity Number: 247797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Use with maintenance of Church Fabric

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £447
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fiona Caroline Norman Trustee 27 October 2023
VICTOR LESLIE TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S STURMINSTER NEWTON CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE DU PRE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF HARRY SAMUEL SENIOR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £402 £414 £429 £444 £447
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hall House
Ingrams
Sturminster Newton
DT10 1FR
Phone:
01258475318
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available