CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE BUNYAN MEETING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to a) provide grants to individuals in Bedford, usually members of the Bunyan Meeting non-conformist Church, b) provide a grant towards the Church ministry, c) maintain the fabric of the church, manse and other investment buildings, d) maintain, operate and publicise the world - renowned John Bunyan Museum and library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 27 June 1966: Standard registration
- BUNYAN MEETING TRUST (Working name)
- BUNYAN TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW STEWART DUTHIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Janet Helen Wootton | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rowlands | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|||||
DOREEN WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR CHRIS WOOTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN FREDERICK CORNISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERRY ANNE PROTHEROE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.82k | £252.11k | £243.51k | £517.32k | £262.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.76k | £329.55k | £409.86k | £314.13k | £377.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.05k | £38.08k | £26.33k | £1.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £375.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £107.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £279.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £305.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2025 | 496 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 March 2025 | 496 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 08/03/1808 DATED 08/07/1851 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Linked charities
- 27 June 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bunyan Meeting
Mill Street
Bedford
MK40 3EU
- Phone:
- 01234213722
- Email:
- BUNYANMEETING@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
bunyanmeeting.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window