THE J A R CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religion in connection with the Roman Catholic Church, provision for the education of persons under the age of 30, provision of food clothing and accommodation for needy persons over the age of 55
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Boland | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||
Benedict Henry Noble | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|||
REVEREND CANON PASCHAL FRANCIS PATRICK TYNAN RYAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.31k | £96.81k | £117.65k | £119.99k | £112.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.00k | £111.00k | £103.51k | £104.66k | £109.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 30 MARCH 1966.
Charitable objects
TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES WITH PROVISION WITHOUT FETTERING TRUSTEES ABSOLUTE DISCRETION TO GIVE PRIOR CONSIDERATON TO :- A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE WORLD. B) PROVISION FOR THE EDUCATION AT SCHOOLS. C) PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND ACCOMMODATION FOR NEEDY PERSONS OVER 50. )FOR FULL DETAILS SEE DEED).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUNTERS
9 NEW SQUARE
LONDON
WC2A 3QN
- Phone:
- 02074120050
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window